Senate | 06/07/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 06/06/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 05/04/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 05/04/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Subsequently, on motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Speaker laid before the House | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Unfinished Business | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Later today assigned. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, TABLED pending FURTHER ACTION. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Transmitted to the Clerk of the 131st Maine Legislature by the Secretary of State on April 10, 2023 and ordered printed. |