Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-546).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-546)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-546) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/25/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/25/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|