Senate | 06/12/2023 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 267 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Reports Read | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | ROLL CALL NO. 144 (Yeas 75 - Nays 66 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 06/05/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/23/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 05/23/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |