Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 292 Yeas 13 - Nays 18 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senator BENNETT of Oxford moved to RECEDE and CONCUR
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved The Senate INSIST To Accept The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 163 (Yeas 77 - Nays 61 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 241 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360).
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-360) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|