Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-314), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/01/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/01/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|