Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | READ ONCE | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out: OTP | ||
Joint | 05/11/2023 | Voted: OTP | ||
Joint | 05/11/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |