Senate | 06/21/2023 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Reports Read | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
Joint | 06/20/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 04/28/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 04/28/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |