Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-395).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 298 Yeas 13 - Nays 20 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-395).
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-395) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 173 (Yeas 79 - Nays 63 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/10/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/10/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|