Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-281), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-281).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/09/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/09/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Representative MOONEN for the Family Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 19-A, section 354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
|
|
|