Senate | 06/15/2023 | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | FINALLY PASSED. | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-485), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-485) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-485). | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 06/13/2023 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/10/2023 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/10/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |