Senate | 05/25/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 05/23/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 05/18/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 05/18/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | On motion of Representative Stover of Boothbay, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Transmitted to the Clerk of the 131st Maine Legislature by the Secretary of State on April 21, 2023 and ordered printed. |