Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-797), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-797) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 577 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-797).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-797) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 391 (Yeas 81 - Nays 60 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/16/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/16/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
11/08/2023
|
Work Session Held: TAB
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|