Senate | 06/12/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-393), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-393). | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 06/07/2023 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/22/2023 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/22/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |