House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/10/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/10/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED and The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland From the Committee on JUDICIARY the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported Out: REF TO CJPS
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|