Senate | 06/15/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-288). | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-288). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee Amendment "A" (S-288) READ and ADOPTED. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/16/2023 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/16/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |