Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-613).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-613) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 435 (Yeas 78 - Nays 66 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-613)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-613) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 625 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/25/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|