Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-899) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-899) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-899) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-899) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-853).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-853).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-853).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-853) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/07/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/07/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/25/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|