Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 312 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401).
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Resolve was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 183 (Yeas 79 - Nays 62 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/17/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/17/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|