Senate | 06/21/2023 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 421 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Reports Read | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
Joint | 06/20/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |