Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator House Amendment "A" (H-711) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby House Amendment "A" (H-711) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-711) thereto
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-711) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-711) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
House Amendment "A" (H-711) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
On motion by Senator INGWERSEN of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-711) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, House Amendment "A" (H-711) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) was READ and ADOPTED thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-493) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Subsequently, on motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|