Senate | 04/01/2024 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 03/27/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 03/14/2024 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 03/14/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Joint | 12/11/2023 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 07/25/2023 | Carry Over Approved | ||
Joint | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Requested | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |