Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-778), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-778) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
On motion by Senator DUSON of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-778).
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-778) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The Resolve was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/24/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/24/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/23/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|