Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-818) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-818) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
House Amendment "A" (H-818) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-818) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-818) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, House Amendment "A" (H-818) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-781) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
On motion of Representative DOUDERA of Camden, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/11/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/11/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/04/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|