Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-941) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-941) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 684 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
House Amendment "A" (H-941) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 683 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-941) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-941) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 473 (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, House Amendment "A" (H-941) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-929) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 472 (Yeas 76 - Nays 69 - Absent 5 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/20/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/20/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/06/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|