Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-946) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-946) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 692 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-946).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-946) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 501 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 6 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Work Session Reconsidered
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/13/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/21/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/25/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
On motion by Senator Bailey of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in Non-concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|