Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-799) and House Amendment "A" (H-836) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
House Amendment "A" (H-836) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-799) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-799) and House Amendment "A" (H-836)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, House Amendment "A" (H-836) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-799) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Committee Report was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
On OBJECTION of Representative PERRY of Calais REMOVED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/23/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|