House | 04/02/2024 | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Reports READ | ||
Joint | 03/29/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 01/23/2024 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 01/23/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 07/26/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 07/25/2023 | Carry Over Approved | ||
Joint | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Requested | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |