Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-554).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-554) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-554)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-554) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 576 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/30/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/30/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|