Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 328 (Yeas 74 - Nays 52 - Absent 25 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-385).
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-385) was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 310 (Yeas 63 - Nays 77 - Absent 10 - Excused 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
On motion of Representative BRADSTREET of Vassalboro, House Amendment "A" (H-703) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-385) FAILED ADOPTION.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-385) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 309 (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 6 - Excused 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-385)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-385) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 414 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|