Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 193 (Yeas 120 - Nays 20 - Absent 9 - Excused 1 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Representative TERRY of Gorham REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-233).
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-233).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-233) READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|