Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 446 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-413).
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-413).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/06/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/06/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|