Senate | 05/30/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
Joint | 05/22/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 05/22/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |