Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 514 (Yeas 70 - Nays 68 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-960) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-960) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 718 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Senator PIERCE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-960).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-960) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 508 (Yeas 74 - Nays 69 - Absent 7 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/19/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/19/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/05/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Select Committee on Housing suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|