Joint | 05/10/2024 | Carry Over Approved | ||
Joint | 04/10/2024 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
Senate | 07/26/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Requested | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |