House
|
07/06/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 353 (Yeas 77 - Nays 52 - Absent 22 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Senator LAWRENCE of York asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion Reconsideration of Passage to be Enacted. In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending RECONSIDERATION of PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 339 (Yeas 63 - Nays 76 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
Subsequently, FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 338 (Yeas 73 - Nays 65 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill FAILED of PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
RELEASED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
HELD.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 332 (Yeas 62 - Nays 69 - Absent 20 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-421).
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 321 (Yeas 69 - Nays 65 - Absent 17 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-421)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-421) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 444 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/22/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/07/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/07/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|