Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-822) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-822) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 601 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-822).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-822) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 410 (Yeas 74 - Nays 61 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/14/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/14/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On motion by Senator Bailey of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/25/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|