House
|
05/10/2024
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-764) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-764) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-764) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-763)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-763), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 556 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-763).
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 373 (Yeas 77 - Nays 54 - Absent 19 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/30/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/30/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
01/25/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|