Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 01/09/2024 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 01/09/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 07/26/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 07/25/2023 | Carry Over Approved | ||
House | 06/23/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 06/23/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
House | 06/23/2023 | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Bill and accompanying papers REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED |