Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-602).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-602) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 426 (Yeas 118 - Nays 25 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-602)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-602) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 622 Yeas 28 - Nays 6 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/27/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/27/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 11, 2023 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
|
|
|