Senate | 05/10/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-861), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-861) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-861). | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 03/22/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 02/22/2024 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 02/22/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 11, 2023. |