Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-832) in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-832) READ and ADOPTED | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | READ ONCE | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reports Read | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-832). | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-832) was READ and ADOPTED. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | The Bill was READ ONCE. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Reports READ. | ||
Joint | 03/15/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP | ||
Joint | 02/27/2024 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 02/27/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 11, 2023. |