Senate | 02/28/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Ordered sent down forthwith | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | READ ONCE | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Report READ and ACCEPTED | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Reported Out: OTP | ||
Joint | 01/22/2024 | Voted: OTP | ||
Joint | 01/22/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 11, 2023. |