Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-550).
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-550) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
The Resolve was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-550)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-550) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 566 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/06/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/06/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|