Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-583). | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-583). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (S-583) READ and ADOPTED. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Report READ and ACCEPTED. | ||
Joint | 03/19/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 01/29/2024 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 01/29/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |