Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-827), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-827) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-827).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/15/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/15/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/15/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/14/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|