Senate | 03/05/2024 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 02/29/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |