Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-884), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-884) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-884). | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 03/29/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 02/22/2024 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 02/22/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Joint | 02/15/2024 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |