Senate | 02/28/2024 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reports Read | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 02/23/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 02/06/2024 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 02/06/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |