Senate | 04/10/2024 | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Reports READ | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | ROLL CALL NO. 467 (Yeas 84 - Nays 61 - Absent 5 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Joint | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP | ||
Joint | 03/06/2024 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 03/06/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |