House
|
05/10/2024
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-774) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-774) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-774) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-876)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-876), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-876).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/06/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/06/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|